Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grear, Kenneth B, against Hands, Tasha, Mayo, Daniel, represented by Doherty Jr, James A, Meindl, Kristine M, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with TURNER, CAROLINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: June 14, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-05-23T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: May 31, 2023REPLY TO NEW MATTER & CROSSCLA
Date: June 26, 2023SATISFACTION / ARB AWARD FILED
Date: October 17, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: May 31, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 09, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00REPORT & AWARD OF ARBITRATORS
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-05-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN- PA.R.C.P. #1307
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 1 DEFT
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST ARBITRATION
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00TRANSFER FROM MUNICIPAL COURT
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.