Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Baker, Trummel filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with JUDGE, SUPERVISING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryPenndot-Motor Vehicle Appeals |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: April 21, 2023ORDER ENTERED-TRIAL CONTINUED
Date: July 14, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: July 14, 2023LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: July 14, 2023LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 06, 2023ORDER ENTERED-TRIAL CONTINUED
Date: October 06, 2023LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: April 21, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00MOT-PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED-TRIAL CONTINUED
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF STATUTORY APPEAL
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED-TRIAL CONTINUED
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.