Servis One Inc,
Servis One, Inc,
filed a(n)
Landlord-Tenant -
Property
case
represented by
Smith, Sherri J,
against
Scott, Mikera,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with MOORE, MARK presiding.
Case Details for
Servis One Inc v. Scott, Mikera
, et al.
Case Events for
Servis One Inc v. Scott, Mikera
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
December 18, 2023
PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE ORDER TO DISCONTINUE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SERVIS ONE INC)
November 08, 2023
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR 11/20/23 CONCILIATION HRG UPON MIKERA SCOTT BY FIRST CLASS REGULAR MAIL ON 11/06/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SERVIS ONE INC)
September 25, 2023
LISTED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
September 25, 2023
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
September 25, 2023
WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT: THE PARTIES ARE ATTEMPTING TO REACH AN AGREEMENT. A NEW CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11.20.2023 AT 9:30 A.M. O?CLOCK IN COURTROOM 676 CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA. DEFENDANT MAY APPEAR AT THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IN PERSON, BY PHONE, OR VIA ZOOM PER ATTACHED INFORMATION SHEET. **PLAINTIFF IS STAYED FROM ENTERING A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) UNTIL SUCH TIME AS PERMITTED IN FURTHER ORDER ** BY THE COURT: THOMAS-STREET, J., 09.20.2023
September 25, 2023
Docket Event
LISTED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11.20.2023 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 676 CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA
September 25, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 26-SEP-2023 OF WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE ENTERED ON 25-SEP-2023.
May 24, 2023
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DIVER UPON MIKERA SCOTT BY FIRST CLASS REGULAR MAIL ON 05/24/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SERVIS ONE INC)