Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GROVE-BUTLER VS WELDON
A Motor Vehicle Accident case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge FLETMAN, ABBE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 07, 2022
Last Refreshed
January 19, 2024
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Consolidation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | hearing |
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR Judge: unassigned |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 30-23082230 IT IS ORDERED THAT CASES #221000671 AND #230600542 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY AND ARBITRATION, WITH CASE #230600542 AS THE LEAD. BY THE COURT ...FLETMAN,J 9/14/2 |
|
August 11, 2023 | hearing |
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED 30-23082230 NOTICE: A MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WAS FILED ON THIS DATE IN 230600542 REQUESTING CONSOLIDATION WITH 221000671, 230600542. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN OF ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 15-APR-2024. |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE, THE REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED. THE HEARING IS RESCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2024 AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER. NOTICE GIVEN UNDER PARCP 236. |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED ARBITRATION CONTINUANCE/DEFERRAL APPLICATION FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF LISA WELDON) |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED RESCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON APRIL 15, 2024, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR. |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 26-JUL-2023 OF CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED ENTERED ON 26-JUL-2023. |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 17-22123117 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT, LISA WELDON, SHALL PROVIDE VERIFIED ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR INTERROGATORIES NO LATER THAN TWENTY(20)DAYS FROM THE DOCKETING OF THIS ORDER OR APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS MAY BE IMPOSED UPON DEFENDANT'S FOLLOWING AN APPLICATION TO THE COURT.....................BY THE COURT: FLETMAN, J. 01/06/2023 |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 06-JAN-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 06-JAN-2023. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 17-22123117 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: FLETMAN, ABBE F. ON DATE: JANUARY 03, 2023 |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 17-22123117 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SAVIO GROVE-BUTLER) |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 17-22123117 MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 12/22/2022. RESPONSE DATE: 12/29/2022. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SAVIO GROVE-BUTLER) |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF LISA WELDON FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SAVIO GROVE-BUTLER) |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF LISA WELDON) |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF ALBERT A GRIFFITH AND MARCOS LONG FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF LISA WELDON) |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON LISA WELDON BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/09/0022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SAVIO GROVE-BUTLER) |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2210013821 |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON AUGUST 11, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR. |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none. |
|