Heck, Ryan,
Michelle, Heck,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Rapkin, Robert A,
against
Ford Motor Company,
represented by
Peterson, James,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with GARCIA, DAMARIS presiding.
Case Details for
Heck, Ryan v. Ford Motor Company
, et al.
Case Events for
Heck, Ryan v. Ford Motor Company
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
August 15, 2023
Docket Event
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF HECK MICHELLE AND RYAN HECK)
August 11, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
August 09, 2023
Docket Event
SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION THE ARBITRATION CENTER HAVING BEEN ADVISED THAT THE WITHIN CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED, THE CASE SHALL BE MARKED "DISCONTINUED" ON THE PROTHONOTARY'S DOCKET AND REMOVED FROM THE APPLICABLE LIST AND INVENTORY OF PENDING CASES. THIS CASE MAY BE RESTORED TO THE ARBITRATION LIST ONLY UPON WRITTEN ORDER OF THE MOTION PROGRAM JUDGE. THIS RELIEF SHALL BE REQUESTED BY FORMAL MOTION. IT IS FURTHER DIRECTED THAT IN THE FOLLOWING TYPES OF CASES ADDITIONAL STEPS MUST BE TAKEN TO OFFICIALLY CONCLUDE THE CASE: MINOR'S COMPROMISES, INCOMPETENT/INCAPACITATED PERSON'S COMPROMISES, WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTIONS (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2039,2064,2206, PHILA CIV. R. NO.2039.1, 2206, AND JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 97-1) AND JOINDER (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2231). ARBITRATION CENTER MANAGEMENT.
August 09, 2023
Docket Event
FILE COPY PRINTED none.
August 09, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 09-AUG-2023 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION ENTERED ON 09-AUG-2023.
December 28, 2022
Docket Event
REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF HECK MICHELLE AND RYAN HECK)
December 15, 2022
Docket Event
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED ON BEHALF OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY.
November 08, 2022
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON FORD MOTOR COMPANY BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 11/03/0022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF HECK MICHELLE AND RYAN HECK)
October 07, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED.