Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alexander, Amyiah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Simon, Marc I, against Sumara, Monika, represented by Fox, Kelly J, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with ABBE F. FLETMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: April 26, 2023SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD
Date: April 03, 2023REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: March 03, 2023PRAE-WITHDRAW PRELIM OBJECTNS
Date: March 03, 2023AMENDED ANSWER FILED
Date: March 03, 2023PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: March 02, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-02-20T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00WAITING TO ISSUE REVISED CMO
Date: March 29, 2023WAITING TO LIST ASSESSMENT
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00CORRECTION TO JUDGMENT INDEX
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00CONFERENCE CANCELLED
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: April 03, 2023COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.