Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Crawley, Robert J, against Gauthney, Robert, Gauthney, Shawn, Successors Assigns And All Persons Firms Or Associations, Unknown Heirs, Successors, Assigns, And All Persons, Firms Or Associations, Unknown Heirs, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with ROBERTS, JOSHUA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryResidential Owner Occupied-Mr |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: June 28, 2023WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: May 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: April 27, 2023PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: April 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: April 21, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00LISTED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00CONCILIATION CONF SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.