Nationstar Mortgage Llc,
filed a(n)
Landlord-Tenant -
Property
case
represented by
Treglia, Carolyn,
against
Ruth, Damian,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with Lisette Shirdan-Harris presiding.
Case Details for
Nationstar Mortgage Llc v. Ruth, Damian
Case Events for
Nationstar Mortgage Llc v. Ruth, Damian
Date
Type
Description
April 07, 2023
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE ORDER TO DISCONTINUE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC)
February 13, 2023
CONCILIATION CONF SCHEDULED
February 13, 2023
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
February 13, 2023
Docket Event
CONCILIATION CONF RESCHEDULED UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT: THE COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAVING BEEN SERVED ON DEFENDANT(S) AT LEAST FOURTEEN (14) DAYS PRIOR TO TODAY?S DATE, AND DEFENDANT(S) HAVING APPEARED FOR THE FIRST CONCILIATION CONFERENCE LISTING AS ORDERED, OR DEFENDANTS HAVING BEEN EXCUSED FROM APPEARING, A SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE LISTING IS SCHEDULED AS FOLLOWS: SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE DATE AND TIME DATE: 05/25/2023 TIME: 1:00 P.M. DEFENDANT(S) IS/ARE REQUIRED TO SUBMIT THEIR COMPLETE FINANCIAL PACKAGE TO PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL AT LEAST FOURTEEN (14) DAYS PRIOR TO THE AFOREMENTIONED SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE LISTING DATE. DEFENDANT MAY APPEAR AT THE SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IN PERSON, BY PHONE, OR VIA ZOOM PER ATTACHED INFORMATION SHEET. PLAINTIFF CERTIFIES THAT THE COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAVE BEEN SERVED ON ALL DEFENDANTS AS REQUIRED BY PULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND THAT THE AFFIDAVIT(S) OF SERVICE REFLECTING THIS HAS/HAVE BEEN PLACED ON THE DOCKET. **PLAINTIFF IS STAYED FROM ENTERING A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) BEFORE ONE DAY AFTER THE SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE OCCURS OR UNTIL SUCH TIME AS IS STATED IN THE SUBSEQUENT ORDER** BY THE COURT: THOMAS-STREET, J., 02/10/2023
February 13, 2023
Docket Event
CONCILIATION CONF SCHEDULED CONCILIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DATE: 05/25/2023 TIME: 1:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 676, CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA
February 13, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 14-FEB-2023 OF CONCILIATION CONF RESCHEDULED ENTERED ON 13-FEB-2023.
November 23, 2022
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PRAE TO REIN CIV ACT COM MOR FOR,REIN CIV ACT COM MOR FOR,CER COM,CAS MAN ORD,MOR NOT,MOR CON INS UPON OCCUPANTS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/19/2022 FILED.
November 23, 2022
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PRAE TO REIN CIV ACT COM MOR FOR,REIN CIV ACT COM MOR FOR,CER COM,CAS MAN ORD,MOR NOT,MOR CON INS UPON DAMIAN RUTH BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/19/2022 FILED.
November 09, 2022
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC)