Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Harrell, Kia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Savoia, Travis J, against Arif, Muhammad, Doe #1-10, John, Lyft Inc, Lyft, Inc., Walters, Kersha Kim, (total of 5) See All represented by Mcgreevey Esq, John F, Perry Esq, Allison L, Vukson, Jillian, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with CARPENTER, LINDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: January 17, 2024NOTICE GIVEN-DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: January 13, 2024LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: 2024-01-11T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2024-01-02T00:00:00EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF/DENIED
Date: 2024-01-02T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: January 18, 2024ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: January 18, 2024CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION DISMISSED
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-12-22T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS SUBM BY AGRMT
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00STIPULATION APPROVED
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00STIPULATION APPROVED
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.