Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brown-Briggs, Khalil, Robinson-Bonds, Sante, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lipschutz, Steven M, against Ari Fleet Lt, Cruickshank, Jesse Michael, Transformers Llc, Transformers, Llc, represented by Sanzo, Robert L, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with FLETMAN, ABBE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: November 28, 2023PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: November 27, 2023FILE COPY PRINTED
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 11, 2023SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 10, 2023CONTINUANCE APPLICATION DENIED
Date: October 10, 2023ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: August 29, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-08-29T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-08-25T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-08-14T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-08-08T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date:For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.