Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnson, Lynette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Simon, Marc I, against Fabian, Adalbert, New Jersey Transit Corporation, represented by Eisner, Jillian, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with THOMAS-STREET, SIERRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE
Date: November 16, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 03, 2022REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: November 02, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: October 28, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 19, 2022COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: October 19, 2022TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY
Date: October 19, 2022ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.