Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania Department Of Transportation filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Engel, Carl L, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryPenndot-Motor Vehicle Appeals |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER ENTERED - FINAL DISPOS
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBITS FILED
Date: January 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-01-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF STATUTORY APPEAL
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: February 08, 2023LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER ENTERED-TRIAL CONTINUED
Date: January 27, 2023ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT BY APPEAL
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.