Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Six Penn Center Associates, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pereira, Daniel M, against Cbc Restaurant Corp., Cbc Restaurant Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Nina N. Wright Padilla presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00STIPULATION APPROVED
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00ATTACHMENT DISSOLVED
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00ANSWERS-INTEROGS IN ATTACHMENT
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00ANSWERS-INTEROGS IN ATTACHMENT
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00ANSWERS-INTEROGS IN ATTACHMENT
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00ANSWERS-INTEROGS IN ATTACHMENT
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00ATTACHMENT DISSOLVED
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00JUDGMENT ENTERED BY ADMISSION
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00JUDGMENT VACATED
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00PETITION TO OPEN JUDGMENT
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00JUDGMENT ENTERED BY ADMISSION
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00ANSWERS-INTEROGS IN ATTACHMENT
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00ATTACHMENT DISSOLVED
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00ATTACHMENT DISSOLVED
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00ATTACHMENT DISSOLVED
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO ISSUE WRIT FILED
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT/FINAL DISP
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: January 17, 2024MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: January 09, 2024MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: September 11, 2023MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: June 06, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: September 07, 2023MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00DEFERRED - BANKRUPTCY
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.