Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burnite, Steven, Panepinto, Lisa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Labletta, Christian P, against Anc Builders Inc, G F Penn Place Llc, Main Street Development Company, Best Quality Exteriors, D&G Masonry, (total of 7) See All represented by Benedict, Andrew R, Werley, Bryan P, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Linda A. Carpenter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryContracts Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE GIVEN
Date: January 16, 2024MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: January 17, 2024RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED
Date: January 12, 2024JOINDER COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 12, 2024MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2024-01-02T00:00:00STIPULATION APPROVED
Date: 2024-01-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2024-01-11T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-12-22T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF/DENIED
Date: 2024-01-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-12-22T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-12-21T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2023-12-21T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: January 17, 2024JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00PRAE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REISSUE SUMMONS
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.