Ibew Local Union No 126,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Mccarthy, Ryan P,
against
American Lighting And Signalization Llc,
represented by
Pinkstone, Wayne E,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with TURNER, CAROLINE presiding.
Case Details for
Ibew Local Union No 126 v. American Lighting And Signalization Llc
Case Events for
Ibew Local Union No 126 v. American Lighting And Signalization Llc
Date
Type
Description
July 17, 2024
Hearing
TRIAL READY POOL CITY HALL COURTROOM 602
Judge: ROBERTS, JOSHUA
June 03, 2024
Hearing
PROJECTED PRE-TRIAL CONF. DATE CITY HALL COURTROOM 602
Judge: ROBERTS, JOSHUA
November 20, 2023
Docket Event
REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION LLC FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF IBEW LOCAL UNION NO 126)
October 31, 2023
Docket Event
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION LLC) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED ON BEHALF OF AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION LLC.
October 04, 2023
Docket Event
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none.
October 04, 2023
Docket Event
LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL none.
October 04, 2023
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED IT IS ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS ASSIGNED TO THE JULY_POOL AND COUNSEL SHOULD ANTICIPATE TRIAL TO BEGIN EXPEDITIOUSLY THEREAFTER. COUNSEL AND PARTIES WILL BE NOTICED FOR TRIAL TO TAKE PLACE DURING THE DESIGNATED TRIAL POOL MONTH. ALL COUNSEL AND PARTIES MUST IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY THE COURT IN WRITING OF ANY SCHEDULING CONFLICTS, INCLUDING TRIAL ATTACHMENTS AND PRE-PAID VACATIONS, AND ARE UNDER A CONTINUING OBLIGATION TO NOTIFY THE COURT OF ANY SUBSEQUENT TRIAL ATTACHMENTS DURING THE TRIAL POOL MONTH. THE TRIAL CONFLICT LETTER MUST BE SUBMITTED NOT LATER THAN THE 20TH DAY PRIOR TO THE START OF THE TRIAL POOL.THE COURT WILL NOT RECOGNIZE ANY UNTIMELY CONFLICT NOTIFICATIONS. FAILURE TO NOTIFY THE COURT OF ANY SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WILL RESULT IN THE ISSUANCE OF APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS. TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE THE TRIAL POOL CONFLICT LETTER, ACCESS THE "EXISTING CASE" SECTION OF THE COURT'S ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM. SELECT "CONFERENCE SUBMISSIONS" AS THE FILING CATEGORY. SELECT "TRIAL POOL CONFLICT LETTER" AS THE DOCUMENT TYPE. IF THE CASE IS NOT CALLED FOR TRIAL DURING THE DESIGNATED TRIAL POOL MONTH, IT WILL AUTOMATICALLY BE ASSIGNED TO THE NEXT TRIAL POOL MONTH AND EACH SUBSEQUENT TRIAL POOL MONTH UNTIL THE MATTER IS CALLED TO TRIAL. PARTIES ARE UNDER A CONTINUING OBLIGATION TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CONFLICT LETTERS BEFORE THE START OF EACH TRIAL POOL MONTH. AND NOW, 04-OCT-2023, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. THE CASE MANAGEMENT AND TIME STANDARDS ADOPTED FOR EXPEDITED TRACK CASES SHALL BE APPLICABLE TO THIS CASE AND ARE HEREBY INCORPORATED INTO THIS ORDER. 2. ALL DISCOVERY IN THE ABOVE MATTER SHALL BE COMPLETED NOT LATER THAN 04-MAR-2024. 3. PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORT, IF APPLICABLE, INCLUDING ANY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT, IS TO BE SERVED ON OPPOSING COUNSEL AND/OR OPPOSING PARTY ON OR BEFORE 04-MAR-2024. 4. DEFENDANT'S AND ANY ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT IS TO BE SERVED ON OPPOSING COUNSEL AND/OR OPPOSING PARTY ON OR BEFORE 01-APR-2024. 5. ALL PRE-TRIAL AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS MUST BE FILED NO LATER THAN 01-APR-2024. 6. A MANDATORY PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE SCHEDULED ANY TIME AFTER 03-JUN-2024. COUNSEL MUST APPEAR AT THE MANDATORY PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH KNOWLEDGE OF THE CASE AND SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS DIRECTIVE WILL RESULT IN THE ISSUANCE OF A RULE RETURNABLE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. EARLIER LISTINGS WILL BE SCHEDULED AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COURT. FAILURE OF ANY UNREPRESENTED PARTY OR COUNSEL TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN THE ISSUANCE OF A RULE RETURNABLE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. TEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE, ALL COUNSEL SHALL SERVE UPON ALL OPPOSING COUNSEL AND/OR OPPOSING PARTIES AND FILE WITH THE COURT A PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM CONTAINING THE FOLLOWING: (a) A CONCISE SUMMARY OF THE NATURE OF THE CASE IF PLAINTIFF OR THE DEFENSE IF DEFENDANT OR ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT; (b) A LIST OF ALL WITNESSES WHO MAY BE CALLED TO TESTIFY AT TRIAL BY NAME AND ADDRESS. COUNSEL SHOULD EXPECT WITNESSES NOT LISTED TO BE PRECLUDED FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; (c) A LIST OF ALL EXHIBITS THE PARTY INTENDS TO OFFER INTO EVIDENCE. ALL EXHIBITS SHALL BE PRE-NUMBERED AND SHALL BE EXCHANGED AMONG COUNSEL PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE. COUNSEL SHOULD EXPECT ANY EXHIBIT NOT LISTED TO BE PRECLUDED AT TRIAL; (d) PLAINTIFF SHALL LIST AN ITEMIZATION OF INJURIES OR DAMAGES SUSTAINED TOGETHER WITH ALL SPECIAL DAMAGES CLAIMED BY CATEGORY AND AMOUNT. THIS LIST SHALL INCLUDE AS APPROPRIATE, COMPUTATIONS OF ALL PAST LOST EARNINGS AND FUTURE LOST EARNING CAPACITY OR MEDICAL EXPENSES TOGETHER WITH ANY OTHER UNLIQUIDATED DAMAGES CLAIMED; AND (e) DEFENDANT SHALL STATE ITS POSITION REGARDING DAMAGES AND SHALL IDENTIFY ALL APPLICABLE INSURANCE CARRIERS, TOGETHER WITH APPLICABLE LIMITS OF LIABILITY; AND (f) EACH COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE AN ESTIMATE OF THE ANTICIPATED LENGTH OF TRIAL. FAILURE TO TIMELY FILE A PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM MAY RESULT IN THE ISSUANCE OF A RULE RETURNABLE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ELECTRONIC FILING PROCEDURES NOT LATER THAN 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE START OF TRIAL. RESPONDING COUNSEL SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS THEREAFTER TO FILE ANY RESPONSE. FOR POOL CASES, THE START OF THE TRIAL IS DEFINED AS THE FIRST DATE OF THE TRIAL POOL LISTING. REQUESTS TO EXTEND ANY CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINE OR FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE MUST BE SUBMITTED BY FILING A MOTION FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF AND FILED PRIOR TO THE EXPIRATION OF THE DEADLINE IN QUESTION. ANY REQUESTS FOR A DATE CERTAIN TRIAL LISTING MUST BE SUBMITTED IN WRITING WITH SPECIFICITY, INCLUDING THE NEED FOR LANGUAGE INTERPRETER, WITH A COPY TO OPPOSING PARTY, AND DIRECTED TO THE HONORABLE ABBE F. FLETMAN, TEAM LEADER, VIA THE COURT'S ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM, AS A TRIAL CONFLICT LETTER. HOWEVER, SAID REQUESTS MAY BE MADE ONLY UNDER EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES. IF A PARTY OR WITNESS REQUIRES A LANGUAGE INTERPRETER, IT IS THE OBLIGATION OF THE PARTY WITH THE REQUIREMENT TO REQUEST THE INTERPRETER FROM THE FIRST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA COURT REPORTER, DIGITAL RECORDING AND INTERPRETER ADMINISTRATION USING THE FORM FOUND AT: https://www.courts.phila.gov/pdf/forms/court-reporters/interpreter-request-form.pdf. THE COURT WILL NOT GRANT CONTINUANCE REQUESTS WHEN COUNSEL OR AN UNREPRESENTED PARTY HAS FAILED TO TIMELY REQUEST A LANGUAGE INTERPRETER. COUNSEL SHOULD HAVE SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL PREPARED TO CONDUCT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR TRIAL WHERE PRACTICABLE. ALL COUNSEL ARE UNDER A CONTINUING OBLLIGATION AND ARE ORDERED TO SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON ALL UNREPRESENTED PARTIES AND UPON ALL COUNSEL ENTERING AN APPEARANCE AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. ...BY THE COURT: ABBE FLETMAN, J.
October 04, 2023
Docket Event
CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED none.
October 04, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 04-OCT-2023 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 04-OCT-2023.
September 22, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04-OCT-2023.