Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilkerson, Chanise, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Obrien, Kevin Patrick, against Brown, Erin, Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products Inc, Target Corporation, represented by Cavalier, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
|
NOT OF REMOVAL TO US DIST CT
Date: November 30, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 28, 2022PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: November 08, 2022ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND
Date: November 08, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00RECORD MAILED/TRANSMITTED
Date: December 01, 2022JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: November 28, 2022JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.