Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wulukau, Nowai, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Munshi, Rahul, against Delta Community Support Services, represented by Jennings, Rufus A, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryEmployment, Wrongful Discharge |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: December 14, 2022SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 21, 2022PRAE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: December 14, 2022LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: December 12, 2022JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: October 21, 2022COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.