Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Reid, Tawana Patina, Wooten, Zaleiph, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Trunk, Michael A, against Abc Companies I-X, Artsana Spa, Artsana Usa Inc, Boppy Company Llc, Does I-X, John, (total of 7) See All represented by Capriotti, Mary Ann, Ruckenstein, Sean K, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
|
NOT OF REMOVAL TO US DIST CT
Date: October 31, 2022PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: October 27, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 27, 2022ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: October 27, 2022ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00RECORD MAILED/TRANSMITTED
Date: November 01, 2022JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.