Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bibbo, Fredric A filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with PADOVA, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryMc - Money Judgment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: August 02, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: March 15, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00PRAECIPE-ATTACH VERIFICATION
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00APPEAL FROM MUNICIPAL COURT
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST ARBITRATION
Date: March 15, 2023LISTED RULE RETURNABLE DATE
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: April 18, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: April 14, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: March 15, 2023WAITING TO LIST M.C. APPEAL
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT BY APPEAL
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.