Shukur Solutions Llc,
filed a(n)
Liens -
Creditor
case
represented by
Harris, Jermaine,
against
Usre 257 Llc,
represented by
Rutala 360, Joseph D,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with Nina N. Wright Padilla presiding.
Case Details for
Shukur Solutions Llc v. Usre 257 Llc
Case Events for
Shukur Solutions Llc v. Usre 257 Llc
Date
Type
Description
November 01, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 74-23093074 UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL , AND AFTER HEARING THEREON, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAME SHALL BE AND HEREBY IS GRANTED. ATTORNEY, JOSEPH D. RUTALA, ESQ. IS DISCHARGED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT USRE 257,LLC. DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE THIRTY (30) DAYS TO RETAIN NEW COUNSEL. ...BY THE COURT: PADILLA, JUDGE 10/30/2023
November 01, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 01-NOV-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 01-NOV-2023.
October 30, 2023
Hearing
MOTION HEARING VIA ADVANCED COMMUN. TECH. REMOTE HEARING
Judge: PADILLA, NINA W
October 13, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 13-OCT-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 13-OCT-2023.
October 13, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 74-23093074 AND NOW, THIS 20TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER , 2023, UPON CONSIDERATION OF JOSEPH D. RUTALA, ESQUIRE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT USRE 257, LLC, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT A RULE IS ISSUED UPON PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT AND ALL INTERESTED PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE BEFORE THIS COURT ON MONDAY, OCTOBER 30, 2023 AT 12:00 P.M. VIA ZOOM (SEE FOOTNOTE 1) WHY SAID MOTION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. JOSEPH D. RUTALA, ESQUIRE SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANT AND SHOW PROOF OF SERVICE AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING. BY THE COURT: JUDGE WRIGHT PADILLA, S.J., 10/13/2023.
October 13, 2023
Docket Event
MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED 74-230903074 MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/2023 AT 12:00 PM VIA ZOOM.
September 22, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 74-23093074 AND NOW, THIS 20TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER , 2023 , UPON CONSIDERATION OF JOSEPH D. RUTALA, ESQUIRE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT USRE 257, LLC , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT A RULE IS ISSUED UPON PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANTS, AND ALL INTERESTED PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE BEFORE THIS COURT ON THURSDAY , OCTOBER 12, 2023 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM (1) WHY SAID MOTION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. JOSEPH D. RUTALA, ESQUIRE SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANT AND SHOW PROOF OF SERVICE AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING. ..(1) SEE FOOTNOTE FOR COMPLETE TERMS. ...BY THE COURT: PADILLA, JUDGE 9/20/2023
September 22, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 22-SEP-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 22-SEP-2023.
September 21, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 21-SEP-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 21-SEP-2023.
September 21, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 29-23086129 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND PROVIDE ALL REQUESTED DOCUMENTS WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER OR SUFFER SANCTIONS AS THE COURT DEEMS APPROPRIATE....................BY THE COURT: PADILLA, J. 09/21/2023