Au, Connor,
Au, Melodie,
Ly, Nu,
Ngan, Jessica,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Rovner, Steven L,
against
Ligon, Contina,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with OVERTON, GEORGE presiding.
Case Details for
Au, Connor v. Ligon, Contina
, et al.
Case Events for
Au, Connor v. Ligon, Contina
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 03, 2023
Docket Event
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF NU LY, JESSICA NGAN, MELODIE AU AND CONNOR AU)
March 03, 2023
Docket Event
AFF OF DEPOSIT-MINR/INCAP PERS AFFIDAVIT OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO ORDER OF COURT REGARDING MINOR'S COMPROMISE/SETTLEMENT. (FILED ON BEHALF OF MELODIE AU)
March 03, 2023
Docket Event
AFF OF DEPOSIT-MINR/INCAP PERS AFFIDAVIT OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO ORDER OF COURT REGARDING MINOR'S COMPROMISE/SETTLEMENT. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CONNOR AU)
November 28, 2022
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
November 28, 2022
Docket Event
ORDER MINORS COMP GRANTED 05-22110205 - MELODIE AU - UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO COMPROMISE A MINOR?S ACTION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT PETITIONER IS AUTHORIZED TO ENTER INTO A SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT. DISTRIBUTION SHALL BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR FULL TERMS. ....BY THE COURT: OVERTON, GEORGE W., J., 11.28.2022
November 28, 2022
Docket Event
ORD MINORS CMP PET GRANTED/DSP 05-22110205 UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO COMPROMISE A MINOR?S ACTION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT PETITIONER IS AUTHORIZED TO ENTER INTO A SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT. DISTRIBUTION SHALL BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR FULL TERMS. ....BY THE COURT: OVERTON, GEORGE W., J., 11.28.2022
November 28, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 28-NOV-2022 OF ORDER MINORS COMP GRANTED ENTERED ON 28-NOV-2022.
November 28, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 28-NOV-2022 OF ORD MINORS CMP PET GRANTED/DSP ENTERED ON 28-NOV-2022.
November 02, 2022
MOTION ASSIGNED
November 02, 2022
Docket Event
MOTION ASSIGNED 62-22110062 MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: OVERTON, GEORGE W. ON DATE: NOVEMBER 02, 2022