Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Peterson, Devinne, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Aversa, Joseph J, against Adams, Rachel, Doe, John, Living 4 Quarters Llc, Living 4 Quarters, Llc, Way Of Life Delaware County, Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Sullivan, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Linda A. Carpenter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: January 09, 2024LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: January 09, 2024NOTICE GIVEN
Date: January 11, 2024CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: November 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2023-11-12T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00MOT-ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00MOT-ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-19T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.