Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Summers, James, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Hunigman, Richard J, against City Of Philadelphia, Golden Rule Llc, Meadows, Henry, Shiloh Temple Community Church Of Broad Street, V2 Properties Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Lopez, Richard P, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with PADOVA, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: October 31, 2022ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND
Date: October 31, 2022NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: January 14, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: November 18, 2022CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00FILE COPY PRINTED
Date: January 14, 2023SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION
Date: January 14, 2023COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: January 23, 2023ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND
Date: November 01, 2022ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00RULE TO FILE COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00PRAE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.