Arch Vi Temple N Gratz St Lp
filed a(n)
General Appeals -
Appeals
case
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with COYLE, ANNE presiding.
ORDER ENTERED - FINAL DISPOS ***PLEASE NOTE: THIS ENTRY IS BEING MADE TO UPDATE THE STATUS OF THE CASE. SEE ORDER ENTERED ON 10/12/22. ...ADR OJR.
October 21, 2022
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
October 21, 2022
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 11-22097111 IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. PETITIONER BE PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYING THE COSTS OF THIS PROCEEDING. 2. PETITIONER BE PERMITTED TO OBTAIN SERVICE OF THE PAPERS FILED WITHOUT COSTS. 3. PETITIONER BE PERMITTED TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AS TO ANY ADDITIONAL COSTS WHICH ACCRUE IN THE COURSE OF THIS PROCEEDING. 4. IF THERE IS A MONETARY RECOVERY BY JUDGMENT OR SETTLEMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PARTY PERMITTED TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, THE EXONERATED FEES AND COSTS SHALL BE TAXED AS COSTS AND PAID TO THE OFFICE OF JUDICIAL RECORDS BY THE PARTY PAYING THE MONETARY RECOVERY. 5. PETITIONER HAS A CONTINUING OBLIGATION TO INFORM THE COURT OF ANY IMPROVEMENT IN PARTY'S FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES THAT WILL ENABLE THE PARTY TO PAY COSTS. 6. FILING PARTY MUST OBTAIN ATTESTED COPIES OF THE ORIGINAL PLEADING FOR SERVICE. IF MORE THAN THIRTY (30) DAYS HAS EXPIRED, THE PLEADING MUST BE REINSTATED FIRST. ...BY THE COURT; ANDERS, J. 10-18-22
October 21, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 24-OCT-2022 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 21-OCT-2022.
October 12, 2022
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
October 12, 2022
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 12-22097112 UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PETITION TO SATISFY JUDGMENT AND APPEAL OF MUNICIPAL COURT DENIAL OF PETITION TO SATISFY JUDGMENT FILED BY PATRICE SIMMONS, IT IS ORDERED AND DECREED THAT SAID PETITION AND ASSOCIATED APPEAL ARE DISMISSED FOR FAILING TO STATE A SUFFICIENT LEGAL BASIS UPON WHICH TO ISSUE A LEGITIMATE ORDER THAT COMPLIES WITH THE STATUTORY REQUIREMENTS; AND DENIED FOR LACK OF MERIT. ... BY THE COURT: ANNE MARIE B. COYLE, J.: 10/7/2022
October 12, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 12-OCT-2022 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 12-OCT-2022.
October 11, 2022
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
October 11, 2022
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 60-22107360 UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY FILED BY APPELLANT/DEFENDANT PATRICE SIMMONS, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. ...BY THE COURT: ROBERTS, J., 10-11-2022