Bank Of America Na,
Bank Of America, N.A.,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Weinberg, Frederic I,
against
Doheny, Charlina L,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with MOORE, MARK presiding.
Case Details for
Bank Of America Na v. Doheny, Charlina L
, et al.
Case Events for
Bank Of America Na v. Doheny, Charlina L
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 17, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
November 01, 2022
Docket Event
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT/FINAL DISP PRAECIPE FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF BANK OF AMERICA NA AND AGAINST CHARLINA L DOHENY FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANSWER WITHIN REQUIRED TIME. PRO-PROTHONOTARY. NOTICE UNDER RULE 236 GIVEN. NOTICE UNDER 237.1 GIVEN. AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED. DAMAGES ASSESSED: $5,132.75
September 30, 2022
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED OF COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE UPON CHARLINA L. DOHENY ON 9/27/2022.
September 12, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED.
September 12, 2022
Docket Event
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2209020248
September 12, 2022
Docket Event
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON JULY 17, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR.