Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Claffey, John B,
against
Bolvin, John,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with GARCIA, DAMARIS presiding.
Case Details for
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na v. Bolvin, John
Case Events for
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na v. Bolvin, John
Date
Type
Description
July 17, 2023
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE ORDER TO DISCONTINUE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA)
July 17, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
June 08, 2023
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA)
June 06, 2023
Docket Event
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND JOHN BOLVIN NOT FOUND ON 05/23/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA)
April 14, 2023
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA)
November 04, 2022
Docket Event
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND JOHN BOLVIN NOT FOUND ON 10/16/2022. (FILED ON BEHALF OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA)
September 12, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED.
September 12, 2022
Docket Event
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON JULY 17, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR.