Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Williams, Gina, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Latour, Jennifer A, against Chester Downs And Marina Llc Ita Dba Aka, Chester Downs & Marina Llc, Harrah'S Chester Downs Management Company Llc, Harrah'S Philadelphia Casino And Racetrack Ita Dba, represented by Reilly, Joseph Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HILL, GLYNNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 02, 2022TRANSFER TO OTHER JURISDICTION
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED
Date: February 10, 2023WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: October 06, 2022WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00RECORD MAILED/TRANSMITTED
Date: January 03, 2023COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 14, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.