Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Toliver, Donna, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Luber, Michael I, against 1898 Realty Llc, Acme Markets Inc, Advanced Service Solutions Inc, Hawk Angel Llc, represented by Ahmed, Tonny, Altschuler, Daniel S, Mcdevitt Hagan, Tracey, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HILL, GLYNNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: January 17, 2024CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: January 17, 2024MOTION/PETITION REPLY FILED
Date: January 17, 2024MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: January 12, 2024MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: January 12, 2024CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2024-01-11T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2024-01-09T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2024-01-05T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN-DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2024-01-02T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN-DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: 2023-12-26T00:00:00LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: 2023-12-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-12-16T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION REPLY FILED
Date: 2023-12-18T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-12-14T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-12-14T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION/STIP WITHDRAWN
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER & CROSSCLA
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-12-09T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-12-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN-DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: 2023-12-09T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00LISTED FOR DISCOVERY HEARING
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-12-06T00:00:00EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF/DENIED
Date: 2023-12-06T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00REPLY TO CROSSCLAIM
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-12-05T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00MOTION-JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS
Date: 2023-12-04T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-11-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-11-16T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-11-15T00:00:00CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: 2023-11-13T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-11-07T00:00:00EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF/DENIED
Date: 2023-11-07T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-11-06T00:00:00ANSWER TO PRELIMINARY OBJCTNS
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-10-30T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-30T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-30T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2023-10-25T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-25T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2023-10-23T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-10-23T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2023-10-22T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2023-10-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-10-13T00:00:00JOINDER COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-10-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-10-06T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-06T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00ANSWER TO PRELIMINARY OBJCTNS
Date: 2023-10-02T00:00:00PREL OBJECT-RESP DATE UPDATED
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00MOTION TO JOIN ADDTIONAL DFT
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-09-05T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL
Date: 2023-09-05T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-08-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-07-13T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-02-20T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS SUBM BY AGRMT
Date: 2023-02-20T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00CORRECTIVE ENTRY
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00REPLY TO CROSSCLAIM
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00MOTION TO JOIN ADDTIONAL DFT
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-09-17T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-09-17T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: January 17, 2024COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2024-01-12T00:00:00MOTION-JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS
Date: 2024-01-12T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.