Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Thomas, Catherine, Williams, Carolyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Garnick, Denise W, against Addison, Olive, Chuk, Fedor, Doe, Jane, Khan, Tauqeer Ahmad, represented by Arner, Bryan V, Peterman, Sabrina Ann, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HILL, GLYNNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: December 18, 2023CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: December 06, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: November 30, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: November 28, 2023CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: November 29, 2023DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: November 29, 2023DISCOVERY MOTION DISMISSED
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: November 28, 2023ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-07T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-09-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-17T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION/STIP WITHDRAWN
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS SUBM BY AGRMT
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00PRAECIPE-ATTACH VERIFICATION
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00STIPULATION APPROVED
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2022-09-23T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00PRAE-WITHDRAW PRELIM OBJECTNS
Date: 2022-09-23T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-09-23T00:00:00ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.