Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
J, C, Young, Brenda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Delbonifro, Michael E, against Teah, Nora, represented by Mecoli, Gino P, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with OVERTON, GEORGE W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 11, 2023PRAECIPE TO SUPPL/ATTACH FILED
Date: November 24, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: November 14, 2023ORD MINORS CMP PET GRANTED/DSP
Date: December 11, 2023MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: November 16, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: December 06, 2023NOTICE FILED
Date: November 16, 2023MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP
Date: November 16, 2023LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00APPEAL FROM ARBITRATORS' AWARD
Date: 2023-11-08T00:00:00REPORT & AWARD OF ARBITRATORS
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN- PA.R.C.P. #1307
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-03-31T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-03-31T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-03-04T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER & CROSSCLA
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00MOTION TO AMEND
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00CORRECTION TO JUDGMENT INDEX
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER & CROSSCLA
Date: 2022-09-03T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00PETITION TO OPEN JUDGMENT
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.