Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
F, T, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Mcleod, Deshawn, Pineda, Oscar D, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with OVERTON, GEORGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
FILE COPY PRINTED
Date: September 29, 2023CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00JUDGMENT COURT ORDER/NON PROS
Date: September 29, 2023ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: September 29, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: May 25, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: May 26, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATION/NON-APPEARANCE
Date: September 29, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00PRAE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.