Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Andrews Jr., Charles, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Doe, John, Greater Philadelphia Young Men'S Christian Association, National Council Of Young Men'S Christian Associations Of Th, Young Mens Christian Association, represented by Benedict, Andrew R, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HERRON, JOHN W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ORDER MINORS COMP GRANTED
Date: June 06, 2022SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD
Date: June 15, 2022WAITING TO ENTER WORKSHEET
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: June 06, 2022MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP
Date: February 25, 2022MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: February 25, 2022AFF OF DEPOSIT-MINR/INCAP PERS
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: June 15, 2022MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: March 24, 2022PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: August 11, 2022MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.