Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Burton, Terrelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Breslin, Matthew, against Zhuo, Chun, represented by Mcgarry, Kevin T, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Denis P. Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenis P. Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: July 12, 2022CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: 2022-06-26T00:00:00CONFERENCE CANCELLED
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE GIVEN
Date: July 12, 2022LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: July 08, 2022LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-12-25T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.