Jenza Inc,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Smirnov, Dimitri,
against
City Framers Llc,
represented by
Mccabe, Christopher I,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with Gary S. Glazer presiding.
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 19-JUL-2022 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD ENTERED ON 19-JUL-2022.
July 19, 2022
Docket Event
SETTLED PRIOR TO ASSGN TRL JUD MATTER SETTLED. BY THE COURT: JUDGE PADILLA, 7/19/2022.
June 03, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 14-JUN-2022.
June 01, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN This case is scheduled for an in-person Settlement Conference on Tuesday, June 14, 2022 at 09:30 AM in Dispute Resolution Center, City Hall, Philadelphia, PA 19107 before Senior Judge Gary S. Glazer. The following people must attend this Settlement Conference: 1) counsel knowledgeable about the case and with authority to settle; and 2) any unrepresented parties. Represented parties must be available in person, via telephone, or virtually during the Settlement Conference. Counsel is required to evaluate the case for settlement purposes and obtain appropriate authority for settlement prior to the conference. No later than ten (10) days prior to the date of the Settlement Conference, counsel are required to serve a Settlement Memorandum of not more than 10 pages in length on Judge Glazer via electronic mail at Gary.Glazer@courts.phila.gov. In addition, counsel must electronically file the same Memorandum with the court and serve a copy on all opposing counsel or pro se parties not electronically served by the court. To file the Settlement Memorandum electronically, access the "Existing Case" section of the court's electronic filing system. Select "Conference Submissions" as the filing type. Select "Settlement Memorandum" as the document type. The Settlement Memorandum shall contain the following: the facts giving rise to the action; the theories of liability or defense; an itemization of damages claimed; current demand; current offer. Copies of relevant documents and expert reports shall be attached to the Settlement Memorandum. The parties may also submit via electronic mail additional, confidential, materials to Judge Glazer alone. Judge Glazer may report to the Team Leader for this case the result of the Settlement Conference. If the case settles prior to the Conference, electronically file a settlement letter. To file the letter electronically, access the "Existing Case" section of the court's electronic filing system. Select "Conference Submissions" as the filing category. Select "Settlement Letter" as the document type. Any questions should be directed to the Commerce Program Administrator at Rachel.Postell@courts.phila.gov and should include all counsel of record. BY THE COURT: NINA PADILLA JUDICIAL TEAM LEADER
June 01, 2022
Docket Event
CONFERENCE DATE SET none.
June 01, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 01-JUN-2022 OF NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 01-JUN-2022.
June 01, 2022
Docket Event
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none.
February 04, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 07-FEB-2022 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 04-FEB-2022.
February 04, 2022
Docket Event
REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Be advised that the Case Management Order issued for the above-captioned action has been revised as follows: All discovery shall be completed not later than 07-MAR-2022. Plaintiff shall submit expert reports not later than 07-MAR-2022. Defendant shall submit expert reports not later than 04-APR-2022. All pre-trial motions other than motions in limine shall be filed not later than 18-APR-2022. A settlement conference will be scheduled any time after 06-JUN-2022. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled at any time after 05-JUL-2022. It is expected that this case shall be ready for trial by 01-AUG-2022. All other terms and conditions on the original Case Management Order will remain in full force and effect. ...BY THE COURT: NINA PADILLA, J.
February 04, 2022
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 07-FEB-2022 OF REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 04-FEB-2022.