Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Brooks Jr Jr., Albert J, against Ramsay Indiv & As Admin Of Est Of Nicole Ramsay, David, Windrift Real Estate Associates, Zurich American Insurance Company, represented by Bodzin, Robert B, Bove, Louis A, Sink, Robert W, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Gary S. Glazer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance, Declaratory Judgmnt |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: February 10, 2023LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: February 10, 2023CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: July 06, 2022MOTION/PETITION/STIP WITHDRAWN
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION/STIP WITHDRAWN
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: July 06, 2022CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2022-06-04T00:00:00REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED
Date: July 06, 2022NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: July 06, 2022DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00OBJECTIONS FILED
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00PRAECIPE-SUBSTITUTE/ATTACH
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00TRANS/NON JURY COMMERCE STAND
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00PRAECIPE-SUBSTITUTE/ATTACH
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00REPLY-PRELIM. OBJECT. FILED
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO SUPPL/ATTACH FILED
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.