Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MCCLELLAND VS SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTA
A Motor Vehicle Accident case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA. Judge Stella M. Tsai presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 12, 2023
Filing Location
Philadelphia County, PA
Category
MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Summary Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2020 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY JUDG/DISP MOT GRANTED 51-20051751 IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED, FOR REASONS SET FORTH IN ORDER. ...BY THE COURT; TSAI, J. 7-24-20 |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 27-JUL-2020 OF SUMMARY JUDG/DISP MOT GRANTED ENTERED ON 24-JUL-2020. |
|
June 27, 2020 | NOTICE GIVEN | ||
June 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN none. |
|
June 25, 2020 | CONFERENCE DATE SET | ||
June 25, 2020 | LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. | ||
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONFERENCE DATE SET none. |
|
June 25, 2020 | LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF | ||
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF none. |
|
June 24, 2020 | MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED | ||
June 24, 2020 | MOTION ASSIGNED | ||
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED 51-20051751 REASSIGNED TO JUDGE TSAI, STELLA ON 24-JUN-20 |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION ASSIGNED 51-20051751 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: ANDERS, DANIEL J. ON DATE: JUNE 24, 2020 |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED 51-20051751 ANSWER IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF BENJAMIN MCCLELLAND) |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF RICHARD J HUNIGMAN AS CO-COUNSEL FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF BENJAMIN MCCLELLAND) |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 51-20051751 RESPONSE DATE 06/22/2020. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY) |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY) |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY) |
|
December 10, 2019 | NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 | ||
December 10, 2019 | LISTED FOR TRIAL | ||
December 10, 2019 | LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF | ||
December 10, 2019 | LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. | ||
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK - AND NOW, 10-DEC-2019, it is Ordered that: 1. The case management and time standards adopted for expedited track cases shall be applicable to this case and are hereby incorporated into this Order. 2. All discovery on the above matter shall be completed not later than 01-JUN-2020. 3. Plaintiff shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial to all other parties not later than 01-JUN-2020. 4. Defendant and any additional defendants shall identify and submit curriculum vitae and expert reports of all expert witnesses intended to testify at trial not later than 06-JUL-2020. 5. All pre-trial motions shall be filed not later than 06-JUL-2020. 6. A settlement conference may be scheduled at any time after 06-JUL-2020. Prior to the settlement conference all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a settlement memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or of the defense if defendant or additional defendant;(b) A statement by the plaintiff or all Damages accumulated, including an itemization of injuries and all special Damages claimed by categories and amount; (c) Defendant shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability. 7. A pre-trial conference will be scheduled any time after 07-SEP-2020. Fifteen days prior to pre-trial conference, all counsel shall serve all opposing counsel and file a pre-trial memorandum containing the following: (a) A concise summary of the nature of the case if plaintiff or the defense if defendant or additional defendant; (b) A list of all witnesses who may be called to testify at trial by name and address. Counsel should expect witnesses not listed to be precluded from testifying at trial; (c) A list of all exhibits the party intends to offer into evidence. All exhibits shall be pre-numbered and shall be exchanged among counsel prior to the conference. Counsel should expect any exhibit not listed to be precluded at trial; (d) Plaintiff shall list an itemization of injuries or Damages sustained together with all special Damages claimed by category and amount. This list shall include as appropriate, computations of all past lost earnings and future lost earning capacity or medical expenses together with any other unliquidated Damages claimed; and (e) Defendant shall state its position regarding Damages and shall identify all applicable insurance carriers, together with applicable limits of liability; (f) Each counsel shall provide an estimate of the anticipated length of trial. 8. It is expected that the case will be ready for trial 05-OCT-2020, and counsel should anticipate trial to begin expeditiously thereafter. 9. All counsel are under a continuing obligation and are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this order upon all unrepresented parties and upon all counsel entering an appearance subsequent to the entry of this order. ...BY THE COURT: Arnold New, J. |
|
December 10, 2019 | CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED | ||
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 10-DEC-2019 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 10-DEC-2019. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED none. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF. none. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR TRIAL none. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
December 10, 2019 | LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF | ||
December 10, 2019 | LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF | ||
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF none. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF none. |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION FILED CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY) (FILED BY CENTER CITY LEGAL REPRODUCTIONS INC) |
|
October 15, 2019 | NOTICE GIVEN | ||
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN none. |
|
October 11, 2019 | LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF | ||
October 11, 2019 | PLF CONTINUANCE REQ APPROVED | ||
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
PLF CONTINUANCE REQ APPROVED none. |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
October 09, 2019 | NOTICE GIVEN | ||
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN none. |
|
October 07, 2019 | LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF | ||
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF BARRY W SMILEY FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY) |
|
July 31, 2019 | WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF | ||
July 31, 2019 | JURY TRIAL PERFECTED | ||
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED. |
|
July 31, 2019 | COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY | ||
July 31, 2019 | ACTIVE CASE | ||
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY none. |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 1907070738 |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED 12 JURORS REQUESTED. |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF none. |
|