Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Offen, David M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Land, Robert, against Seop Inc, represented by Gross, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with ANHALT, DIANA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2019 |
CategoryContracts Other |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: May 18, 2020PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: May 18, 2020ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE GIVEN
Date: May 20, 2020PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00PREL OBJECT-ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.