Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Madigan, Amanda, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Swartz, Brandon A, against Tj Ward Landscaping & Tree Services Inc, Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc, represented by Rubinate, Christopher J, Buchanico, Joanna D, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Diana L. Anhalt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00TRIAL/HEARING EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 13, 2019NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 12, 2019WAITING TO LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00CORRECTIVE ENTRY
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00SETTLEMENT CONF COMPLETED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2019-03-03T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST SETTLMNT CONF
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2019-03-03T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.