Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Handler Studio, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ackelsberg, Irv, against Handler, Peter, Bellovin, Audrey, Levine, Howard, represented by Rosenthal, Michael H, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with COLINS, MARY D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2019 |
CategoryContracts (Goods), Enforce |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00TRIAL/HEARING EXHIBIT LIST
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00POST TRIAL MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2019-02-12T00:00:00FEE PD PURSUANT TO ORDER
Date: April 03, 2019NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00APPEAL WITHDRAWN/DISCONTINUED
Date: May 21, 2019CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00SETTLEMENT CONF COMPLETED
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00PREL OBJECT-ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00PLF CONTINUANCE REQ APPROVED
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-10-21T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 2 DEFTS
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.