Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gutierrez, Rigoberto, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weinberg, Marc A, against Wilkins, Michael, represented by Mirabile Jr, Joseph P, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with ANHALT, DIANA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00TRIAL POOL LISTING CONTINUED
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: May 01, 2019NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00TRIAL POOL LISTING CONTINUED
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00TRIAL POOL LISTING CONTINUED
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00TRIAL/HEARING EXHIBIT LIST
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00SETTLEMENT CONF COMPLETED
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00CORRECTION TO JUDGMENT INDEX
Date: May 06, 2019WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00TRIAL POOL LISTING CONTINUED
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: May 03, 2019ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 1 DEFT
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN- PA.R.C.P. #1307
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2018-02-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.