Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Philadelphia, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Zwolak, James J, against Williams, Henry, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with PATRICK, PAULA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATRICK, PAULA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Estate Tax Lien Petition |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: February 23, 2021PRAECIPE TO DISCONTINUE
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 04, 2020MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: December 04, 2020MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: December 04, 2020MOTION TO REDEEM PREMISES
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2020-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00RULE RETURNABLE SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00RULE RETURNABLE SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00RULE ISSUED
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00RULE ISSUED
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00PETITION TO INTERVENE
Date: 2020-05-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00RULE ISSUED
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SALE (R.E. WRITS)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00MOTION TO REDEEM PREMISES
Date: 2020-02-09T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00RULE ISSUED
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00MOT-POSTPONE SHERIFF SALE
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00PETITION TO INTERVENE
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00WRIT RETURN FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00WRIT RETURN FILED
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00ORDER AND DECREE - FINAL DISPO
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00LISTED RULE RETURNABLE DATE
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00RULE ISSUED-TAX PETITION
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00LISTED RULE RETURNABLE DATE
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00RULE ISSUED-TAX PETITION
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00CIVIL TAX RULE CONTINUED
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00CIVIL TAX RULE CONTINUED
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00CIVIL TAX RULE CONTINUED
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00CIVIL TAX RULE CONTINUED
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00AMENDED TAX CLAIM FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00LISTED FOR RULE RETURNABLE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00CITY CHARGE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.