Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc,
filed a(n)
Landlord-Tenant -
Property
case
represented by
Mckee, Edward J,
against
Miller, Lorraine,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc v. Miller, Lorraine
Case Events for
Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc v. Miller, Lorraine
Date
Type
Description
June 02, 2017
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC)
May 12, 2017
WAITING TO LIST RULE DATE
May 12, 2017
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
May 12, 2017
WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THE COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAVING NOT BEEN SERVED ON DEFENDANT(S), THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IS CANCELLED. A RULE HEARING SHALL BE SCHEDULED FOR PLAINTIFF TO EXPLAIN WHY SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN EFFECTUATED AND WHY A JUDGMENT OF NON PROS SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. ...BY THE COURT: ROBINSON, J., 5/11/17
May 12, 2017
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 15-MAY-2017 OF WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE ENTERED ON 12-MAY-2017.
May 12, 2017
Docket Event
WAITING TO LIST RULE DATE none.
February 01, 2017
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND LORRAINE MILLER NOT FOUND ON 01/07/2017.
January 17, 2017
ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND LORRAINE MILLER NOT FOUND ON 01/06/2017.