Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith, Gregory, Smith, Brenda, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Orourke Jr., John R, against United Artist Theatre Group, Llc., United Artists Theatre Group, Inc., United Artists Theatre Company, Regal Cinemas, Inc., Regal Cinemas Corporation, (total of 8) See All represented by Voci, Gregory P, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Gregory Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2017 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 20, 2017NOTICE GIVEN
Date: September 29, 2017ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00SETTLEMENT CONF COMPLETED
Date: October 18, 2017LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN- PA.R.C.P. #1307
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 8 DEFTS
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST ARBITRATION
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2016-10-15T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2016-07-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.