Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Coronado, Yuriria Alejandra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Beas, Alfonso, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Maria Mihm presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2008 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 937910-Mediation Appointment; Coronado, Y. vs. Beas, A. ; Judge: FL0005 Mihm Maria Additional Info : Maria Judge: Mihm, Maria |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing;C Certified Coronado, Y. vs. Beas, A. Motion OSC Details: 911220 - Domestic Violence ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 937720-Orientation - Respondent; Coronado, Y. vs. Beas, A. ; Judge: FL0005 Mihm Maria Judge: Mihm, Maria |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response or Reply 912830-Response (Petition) Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent RESPONSE (PETITION) [912830] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 937710-Orientation - Petitioner;CNC Ct. Employee-Non Certified Coronado, Y. vs. Beas, A. ; Judge: FL0005 Mihm Maria Judge: Mihm, Maria |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 924110 - Court ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By COURT [924110] |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request 929110-Request Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST [929110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.