Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daley, Deanna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schatz, Steven, against Chau, Hong, Melazzo, Michael, represented by Mchale, Joseph G, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Annette M. Rizzo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 01, 2014MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: November 12, 2014CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: November 24, 2014MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2014-10-12T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2014-10-12T00:00:00CONFERENCE CANCELLED
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00CASE RESCHEDULED BY COURT
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2014-01-10T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2014-07-19T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2014-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 1 DEFT
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.