Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zimmerman, John P, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Zervanos, John N, against Buckley-Alpha-Liberty, A Joint Venture, Sp Engineering Inc, Jbc Associates Inc, Pennsylvania Department Of Transportation, Trumbull Corporation, (total of 12) See All represented by Brehm, Frederick M, Geer, Richard C, Rosenblum, Douglas K, Durkan, Kevin M, Schaer, Theodore M, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with RIZZO, ANNETTE M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2015 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: May 21, 2015MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2015-04-01T00:00:00MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2015-03-28T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-02-12T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION MARKED MOOT
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2015-01-31T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2015-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00CONFERENCE CANCELLED
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION WITHDRAWN MOOT
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00MOTION RESPONSE DATE UPDATED
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-10-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-10-02T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-10-01T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2014-02-11T00:00:00PREL OBJECT-ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2013-10-23T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2013-10-22T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2013-10-22T00:00:00LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2013-10-22T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: 2013-10-22T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2013-10-22T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2013-10-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2013-10-12T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2013-09-24T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2013-09-20T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 8 DEFTS
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.