Leon, Steven,
Leon, Ricardo,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Ibrahim, Jeremy H,
against
Nationwide Insurance Company,
Harkins, Jessica,
Nhan, Bui,
represented by
Dileo Esq, Ronald W,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with Joseph D. O'Keefe presiding.
Case Details for
Leon, Steven v. Nationwide Insurance Company
, et al.
Case Events for
Leon, Steven v. Nationwide Insurance Company
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 01, 2011
AFFIDAVIT-COMPLIANCE WRGFL DTH 91-11025091 AFFIDAVIT OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO ORDER OF COURT REGARDING WRONGFUL DEATH SETTLEMENT. (FILED ON BEHALF OF RICARDO LEON, DECEASED)
April 20, 2011
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED AS TO STEVEN LEON, RICARDO LEON, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE CO., JESSICA HARKINS AND BUI NHAN VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF STEVEN LEON AND RICARDO LEON)
April 19, 2011
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
April 19, 2011
WRONGFUL DEATH ORD/GRANTED/DSP 91-11025091 AND NOW, THIS 18TH DAY OF APRIL, 2011, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PETITION FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION IS GRANTED. DISTRIBUTION IS MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR FULL TERMS RESIDENT IN COURT RECORD. BY THE COURT: JOSEPH D. O'KEEFE, A.J. 4/18/11. NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236.
April 19, 2011
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 20-APR-2011 OF WRONGFUL DEATH ORD/GRANTED/DSP ENTERED ON 19-APR-2011.
March 10, 2011
MOTION ASSIGNED
March 10, 2011
PRAECIPE TO SUPPL/ATTACH FILED 91-11025091 DEPARTMENT OF WELFARE'S LETTER OF POSSIBLE CLAIM TO MOTION FOR WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTION.
March 10, 2011
Docket Event
MOTION ASSIGNED 91-11025091 MOT-APP/DIST OF WRNG DTH/SURV ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: O'KEEFE, JOSEPH D. ON DATE: MARCH 10, 2011
February 09, 2011
MOT-APP/DIST OF WRNG DTH/SURV 91-11025091 RESPONSE DATE 03-01-11.
November 05, 2010
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF RONALD W DILEO FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF BUI NHAN)