Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) case against Martin, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Perry County, PA, . Perry County, PA Superior Courts with Nicholas S. Lippincott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNicholas S. Lippincott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPerry County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Judgment to Common Pleas Filed by SYNCHRONY BANK Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-04 Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-04 Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
September 21, 2018 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Michael E. Schechterly |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Unsuccessfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-04 Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-04 Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
August 22, 2018 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Michael E. Schechterly |
|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-04 Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-04 Applies to Joseph Martin, Defendant |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by SYNCHRONY BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.