Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
First Commonwealth Fcu, Lehigh Valley, filed a(n) case against Najam, Syed H., in the jurisdiction of Northampton County, PA, . Northampton County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Vivian I. Zumas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNorthampton County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 03-1-04 Applies to Syed H. Najam, Defendant |
|
October 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge James J. Narlesky |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 03-1-04 Applies to Syed H. Najam, Defendant |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 03-1-04 Applies to Syed H. Najam, Defendant |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by First Commonwealth FCU |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.