Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bird, Trenton William, filed a(n) case against Richendrfer, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Montour County, PA, . Montour County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Marvin K. Shrawder presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMontour County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by Trenton William Bird Applies to Trenton William Bird, Plaintiff |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
First Class Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 26-3-04 Applies to Trenton William Bird, Plaintiff |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Requested Filed by Trenton William Bird Applies to Jessica Richendrfer, Defendant |
|
March 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 26-3-04 Applies to Jessica Richendrfer, Defendant |
|
March 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 26-3-04 Applies to Jessica Richendrfer, Defendant |
|
March 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Marvin K. Shrawder |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Jessica Richendrfer Applies to Jessica Richendrfer, Defendant |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 26-3-04 Applies to Jessica Richendrfer, Defendant |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Trenton William Bird |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 26-3-04 Applies to Jessica Richendrfer, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.